Global patent index - EP 0986033 A2

EP 0986033 A2 2000-03-15 - A configurable vending machine audit module

Title (en)

A configurable vending machine audit module

Title (de)

Konfigurierbares Prüfungsmodul für einen Verkaufsautomaten

Title (fr)

Module configurable d'audit pour machine de vente

Publication

EP 0986033 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99307191 A

Priority

US 9979598 P

Abstract (en)

A method of auditing data from a vending machine includes providing commands to an audit module installed in the vending machine. The commands indicate a type of vending machine data to be processed by the audit module, how the data is to be processed by the audit module, and a location in memory in the audit module for storage of that type of vending machine data. The audit module is configured to process vending machine data in response to the received commands. Monitored vending machine data can be reported to a remote host in a manner specified by one or commands sent to the audit module. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0986033 A2 20000315; EP 0986033 A3 20000614; AU 4745299 A 20000316; AU 758958 B2 20030403

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20140617

2013-03-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEI, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2012-08-08 [R11X] LEGAL MEANS OF EXECUTION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R11X

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

- Effective date: 20070802

2007-12-12 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 111Z

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

- Effective date: 20070802

2007-02-14 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: 111Z

- Free Format Text: DEESFRGB

- Effective date: 20061103

2006-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEI, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040813

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001211

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI