Global Patent Index - EP 0986039 A1

EP 0986039 A1 2000-03-15 - Device for supplying power to a current loop transmitter

Title (en)

Device for supplying power to a current loop transmitter

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Stromversorgung einer Stromschleifesendestation

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'alimentation d'un émetteur d'une boucle de courant

Publication

EP 0986039 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98116881 A

Priority

EP 98116881 A

Abstract (en)

The signal transmission and current supply device uses a 2-wire line between the transmission station and the reception station, for transmission of an analogue signal current which lies between 2 limit values, representing a parameter value provided by a sensor at the transmission station and simultaneously acting as the supply current for the latter. The transmission station has a controlled current source (34) provided by a series current regulator, coupled to a charge pump (38) providing the operating voltage for the sensor and an associated signal processor.

Abstract (de)

In einer Anordnung zur Signalübertragung zwischen einer Empfangsstation (10) und einer Sendestation (12) sowie zur Stromversorgung der Sendestation (12), wobei die beiden Stationen über eine Zweidrahtleitung (14) miteinander verbunden sind, wird über diese Zweidrahtleitung ein zwischen zwei Grenzwerten veränderlicher analoger Signalstrom übertragen, der einen in der Sendestation (12) von einem Sensor erfaßten Meßwert repräsentiert. Dieser Strom bildet gleichzeitig den für den Betrieb der Sendestation (12) erforderlichen Versorgungsstrom. In der Sendestation (12) ist eine Schaltung (24) vorgesehen, die eine konstante Betriebsspannung für die Sendestation erzeugt, wobei die Sendestation eine steuerbare Stromquelle (34) enthält, die den über die Zweidrahtleitung (14) fließenden Strom in Abhängigkeit von dem Meßwert bestimmt und die aus einer Versorgungsspannungsquelle (18) in der Empfangsstation (10) gespeist wird. Der Stromregler (34) ist ein Serienstromregler, der aus der Versorgungsspannungsquelle (18) in der Empfangsstation (10) gespeist wird. Mit dem Ausgang der Stromquelle (34) ist eine Ladungspumpe (38) verbunden, die aus der am Ausgang der Stromquelle (34) auftretenden Spannung die für den Betrieb des Sensors (20) und einer mit diesem verbundenen Signalverarbeitungsschaltung (22) erforderliche Betriebsspannung erzeugt. Mit dem Eingang oder mit dem Ausgang der Ladungspumpe (38) ist ein Parallelregler (40, 42) zum Konstanthalten der Eingangsspannung bzw. der Ausgangsspannung der Ladungspumpe (38) verbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08C 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 19/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0986039 A1 20000315; EP 0986039 B1 20081029; CA 2281156 A1 20000307; CA 2281156 C 20020709; DE 59814313 D1 20081211; JP 2000132781 A 20000512; JP 3348051 B2 20021120; US 6703943 B1 20040309

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160921

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130907

2014-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130907

2014-06-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140530

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130907

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120928

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121010

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-10-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090730

2008-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59814313 P 20081211

2008-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2008-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071109

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENDRESS + HAUSER GMBH + CO.KG.

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000418

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI