Global patent index - EP 0986044 A2

EP 0986044 A2 2000-03-15 - Display units and components thereof

Title (en)

Display units and components thereof

Title (de)

Anzeigeeinrichtungen und daraus hergestellten Komponenten

Title (fr)

Unités d'affichage et composants associés

Publication

EP 0986044 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99306953 A

Priority

  • JP 29129198 A
  • JP 1444299 A

Abstract (en)

Segments of EL fiber 2 constituting characters to be displayed are fitted with "A" rubber terminals 3, one for each. Core electrode 2b of each segment is inserted entirely through a hole 10a formed in the base panel 10 at a point conforming to the character to be displayed. A "B" rubber terminal 4 is fitted around the portion of the core electrode 2b that has passed through and protruded beyond the base panel 10. The free end portion of the core electrode 2b thus protruded is bent to a direction parallel with the back side of the base panel 10 until it rests in a slit 4c. In this way an outside electrode 2a is brought into contact under pressure with a first conducting member 12a through a conducting rubber 3a, and the core electrode 2b is pressed and contacted with a second conducting member 12b through a conducting rubber 4a, thus establishing a conductive state up to an input terminal 6. The EL fiber segments as linear light sources on the base panel can form characters, patterns, symbols, etc. in a two- or three- dimensional arrangement for display. The used EL fiber segments may serve different duties again and again. The construction is simple and inexpensive and consumes small power for accentuated display of interior decorations, etc. Without the need of soldering, the display unit is safely used, e.g., as teaching aids. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/30 (2006.01); G09F 9/00 (2006.01); G09F 13/00 (2006.01); G09F 13/22 (2006.01); H05B 33/00 (2006.01); H05B 33/06 (2006.01); H05K 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/22 (2013.01); G09F 2013/222 (2013.01); H05K 1/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0986044 A2 20000315; EP 0986044 A3 20001011; CN 1247358 A 20000315; JP 2000148050 A 20000526; KR 20000022964 A 20000425

INPADOC legal status

2002-03-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-08-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 09F 13/22 A, 7H 05B 33/00 B, 7G 09F 9/33 B

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI