Global Patent Index - EP 0986047 A2

EP 0986047 A2 2000-03-15 - Audio encoding system

Title (en)

Audio encoding system

Title (de)

System zur Audiokodierung

Title (fr)

Système de codage audio

Publication

EP 0986047 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99202927 A

Priority

GB 9819920 A

Abstract (en)

A method of switching between long and short block encoding of frames of audio data with improved noise reduction in relation to the number of bits required for encoding. The method comprises the steps of calculating the difference in the long block perceptual entropy of a present frame and the preceding frame and switching to short block encoding of the present frame if the difference is greater than a first threshold. The method may further comprising the steps of comparing the long block perceptual entropy of the succeeding frame with a second threshold if the difference is greater than the first threshold, and switching to short block encoding of the succeeding frame if the long block perceptual entropy of the succeeding frame is greater than the second threshold. The method may additionally or alternatively involve the study of the perceptual entropy of short blocks. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 19/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/18 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 19/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0986047 A2 20000315; EP 0986047 A3 20010926; GB 9819920 D0 19981104

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-07-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TANDBERG TELEVISION ASA

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI