Global Patent Index - EP 0986083 A2

EP 0986083 A2 2000-03-15 - Magnetothermal circuit breaker

Title (en)

Magnetothermal circuit breaker

Title (de)

Thermomagnetischer Schutzschalter

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur magnéto-thermique

Publication

EP 0986083 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99115552 A

Priority

IT MI981975 A

Abstract (en)

A magnetothermal circuit breaker comprising a casing (103) which contains an electrical protection device (110) associated with a magnetic trip-off kinematic system (114), a kinematic system for actuating the moving contact (111), an arc chute (112), a thermal trip-off kinematic system (113), a connection means (115) for the external electrical connections; the thermal trip-off kinematic system includes a bimetallic member which is operatively associated with a linkage whose initial position with respect to the bimetallic member can be adjusted mechanically. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/74; H01H 71/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/74 (2006.01); H01H 71/04 (2006.01); H01H 71/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/7427 (2013.01); H01H 71/04 (2013.01); H01H 71/2409 (2013.01); H01H 2071/7454 (2013.01); H01H 2300/048 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0986083 A2 20000315; EP 0986083 A3 20000809; EP 0986083 B1 20070307; DE 69935382 D1 20070419; IT 1302051 B1 20000720; IT MI981975 A1 20000308; IT MI981975 D0 19980908

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070307

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070806

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071026

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070806

2008-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071210

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070609

2007-10-26 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-06-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070618

2007-05-02 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BOSATELLI, DOMENICO

2007-05-02 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PIANEZZOLA, SERGIO

2007-05-02 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CONTARDI, AUGUSTO

2007-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69935382 P 20070419

2007-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-03-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-05-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI