Global Patent Index - EP 0986123 A2

EP 0986123 A2 2000-03-15 - Transition between two square waveguides rotated through 45

Title (en)

Transition between two square waveguides rotated through 45

Title (de)

Übergang zwischen zwei um 45 gegeneinander verdrehten Quadrathohlleitern

Title (fr)

Transition entre deux guides d' ondes carrés, tournés de 45

Publication

EP 0986123 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99110747 A

Priority

DE 19839889 A

Abstract (en)

The waveguide coupling is provided by one or more round and/or rectangular hollow waveguide sections (5,6,7) inserted between 2 rectangular hollow waveguides (1,2) rotated through 45degrees relative to one another. The hollow waveguide sections have an inner diameter which does not exceed the inner diameter of both waveguides to be coupled.

Abstract (de)

Ein solcher Übergang zwischen zwei um 45° gegeneinander verdrehten Quadrathohlleitern (1,2) kann mit wenig aufwendigen Verfahren hergestellt werden, wenn dieser Übergang aus ein oder mehreren Rundhohlleiterabschnitten (7) und/oder Quadrathohlleiterabschnitten (5, 6) mit abgerundeten Ecken besteht, wobei die Innenquerschnittsabmessungen dieser Hohlleiterabschnitte (5, 6, 7) die Innenquerschnittsabmessungen der ihnen benachbarten Quadrathohlleiter (1, 2) nicht überschreiten. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/02; H01P 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/02 (2006.01); H01P 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 5/082 (2013.01); H01P 1/022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0986123 A2 20000315; EP 0986123 A3 20010829; DE 19839889 C1 20000511

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-03-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: TRANSITION BETWEEN TWO SQUARE WAVEGUIDES ROTATED THROUGH 45

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MARCONI COMMUNICATIONS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020220

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI