Global Patent Index - EP 0986135 A1

EP 0986135 A1 2000-03-15 - Shielded cable connector and method for connecting a shielded cable to it

Title (en)

Shielded cable connector and method for connecting a shielded cable to it

Title (de)

Abgeschirmter Kabelstecker und Verfahren um daran ein abgeschirmtes Kabel zu verbinden

Title (fr)

Connecteur pour câble blindé et procédé pour la connexion d'un câble blindé à celui-ci

Publication

EP 0986135 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202973 A

Priority

NL 1010081 A

Abstract (en)

In a method for connecting a connector to a shielded cable, the cable having a plurality of wires, a common shielding and an outer jacket, the wires and the shielding are exposed at one end of the cable. A first sleeve-like body is provided on the outer jacket near the exposed shielding and the exposed shielding is laid on the first body. A second sleeve-like body is mounted on the first body to thereby clamp the exposed shielding between both bodies. The exposed wires are connected to contacts accommodated in an insulating housing and the bodies are mounted in a chamber of first and second hood parts. The first body is mounted on the outer jacket by crimping an axial section of the first body at its end directed away from the exposed shielding, and the second body is provided with a conical part which is pressed on the first body while clamping the exposed shielding by mounting the bodies in the chamber of the hood parts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/05; H01R 9/03; H01R 13/434

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/03 (2006.01); H01R 9/05 (2006.01); H01R 13/434 (2006.01); H01R 13/512 (2006.01); H01R 13/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/032 (2013.01); H01R 9/05 (2013.01); H01R 13/434 (2013.01); H01R 9/0518 (2013.01); H01R 13/512 (2013.01); H01R 13/5816 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IE SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0986135 A1 20000315; EP 0986135 B1 20080528; EP 0986135 B8 20080716; DE 69938810 D1 20080710; NL 1010081 C2 20000315

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160914

2017-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69938810

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150930

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150908

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FCI ASIA PTE. LTD, SG

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FCI, GUYANCOURT, FR

- Document: DE 69938810

- Effective date: 20150113

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FCI, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FCI, VERSAILLES, FR

- Document: DE 69938810

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FCI ASIA PTE. LTD, SG

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FCI, VERSAILLES, FR

- Document: DE 69938810

- Effective date: 20120419

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080913

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080913

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-06-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080913

2009-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090303

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080528

2008-09-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-08-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69938810 P 20080710

2008-06-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FCI

2008-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE SE

2008-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FCI

2008-04-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FCI

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IE SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IE SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI