Global Patent Index - EP 0986140 A2

EP 0986140 A2 2000-03-15 - Electrical female terminal

Title (en)

Electrical female terminal

Title (de)

Elektrische Kontaktbuchse

Title (fr)

Contact électrique femelle

Publication

EP 0986140 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99202556 A

Priority

DE 19841239 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical female terminal (10), for mating with an electrical terminal pin, comprising a socket member (12) and a sleeve (14) substantially surrounding the socket member; wherein the socket member is substantially tubular with a longitudinal axis (A) and comprises first and second pairs of spring arms (22,24) which extend in the longitudinal direction to define walls of a bore (20) for receiving the terminal pin; an annular member (26) at one end of the bore connected with the spring arms; a first arcuate member (28) at the other end of the bore connected to the first pair of spring arms; and a second arcuate member (30) at the other end of bore connected to the second pair of spring arms; the first and second arcuate members defining an opening (32) which is substantially circular through which the terminal pin can pass; first spring arms (34,38) of the first and second pairs of spring arms being bent inwardly to define opposed contact edges (36,40); second spring arms (42,46) of the first and second pair of spring arms being bent inwardly to define opposed contact edges (44,48); the contact edges of the first spring arms lying in a first plane (P1) substantially perpendicular to the longitudinal axis; the contact edges of the second spring arms lying in a second plane (P2) substantially perpendicular to the longitudinal axis and axially spaced from the first plane; and wherein the sleeve engages the annular member at one end (50) and has a predetermined minimum clearance (X) with the arcuate members at the other end (52). Reduces the force required to insert the terminal pin. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/11

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/115 (2006.01); H01R 13/18 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/18 (2013.01); H01R 13/111 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0986140 A2 20000315; EP 0986140 A3 20001227; EP 0986140 B1 20030312; DE 19841239 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170825

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170823

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030804

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-06-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905826 P 20030417

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020125

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010627

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 13/11 A, 7H 01R 13/115 B, 7H 01R 13/193 B, 7H 01R 13/18 B

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI