Global Patent Index - EP 0986140 A3

EP 0986140 A3 2000-12-27 - Electrical female terminal

Title (en)

Electrical female terminal

Title (de)

Elektrische Kontaktbuchse

Title (fr)

Contact électrique femelle

Publication

EP 0986140 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99202556 A

Priority

DE 19841239 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0986140A2] An electrical female terminal (10), for mating with an electrical terminal pin, comprising a socket member (12) and a sleeve (14) substantially surrounding the socket member; wherein the socket member is substantially tubular with a longitudinal axis (A) and comprises first and second pairs of spring arms (22,24) which extend in the longitudinal direction to define walls of a bore (20) for receiving the terminal pin; an annular member (26) at one end of the bore connected with the spring arms; a first arcuate member (28) at the other end of the bore connected to the first pair of spring arms; and a second arcuate member (30) at the other end of bore connected to the second pair of spring arms; the first and second arcuate members defining an opening (32) which is substantially circular through which the terminal pin can pass; first spring arms (34,38) of the first and second pairs of spring arms being bent inwardly to define opposed contact edges (36,40); second spring arms (42,46) of the first and second pair of spring arms being bent inwardly to define opposed contact edges (44,48); the contact edges of the first spring arms lying in a first plane (P1) substantially perpendicular to the longitudinal axis; the contact edges of the second spring arms lying in a second plane (P2) substantially perpendicular to the longitudinal axis and axially spaced from the first plane; and wherein the sleeve engages the annular member at one end (50) and has a predetermined minimum clearance (X) with the arcuate members at the other end (52). Reduces the force required to insert the terminal pin. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/11; H01R 13/115; H01R 13/18; H01R 13/193

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/115 (2006.01); H01R 13/18 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/18 (2013.01); H01R 13/111 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0986140 A2 20000315; EP 0986140 A3 20001227; EP 0986140 B1 20030312; DE 19841239 A1 20000316

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030804

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-06-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69905826

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020125

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010627

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 13/11 A, 7H 01R 13/115 B, 7H 01R 13/193 B, 7H 01R 13/18 B

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI