Global Patent Index - EP 0986199 A2

EP 0986199 A2 2000-03-15 - Receiver for receiving Digital Audio Broadcast (DAB) programmes

Title (en)

Receiver for receiving Digital Audio Broadcast (DAB) programmes

Title (de)

Empfänger für den Empfang von digitalen Rundfunkprogrammen DAB

Title (fr)

Récepteur pour la réception de programmes de radiodiffusion numérique DAB

Publication

EP 0986199 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99307160 A

Priority

JP 25557798 A

Abstract (en)

A receiver of digital audio broadcasting for broadcasting a plurality of programs through a single transmission band, comprising: a scanning operation section and a scanning stop operation section which are connected to a control section, wherein, by operating said scanning operation section, at least some of said plurality of programs are selected in sequence and broadcast respectively for the designated time and, by operating said scanning stop operation section during the broadcasting of a specified program of said plurality of programs for the designated time, the specified program is broadcast successively, thus enabling an easy search for a favorite program. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04J 11/00 (2006.01); H04B 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 40/18 (2013.01); H04H 20/28 (2013.01); H04H 20/57 (2013.01); H04H 60/43 (2013.01); H04H 2201/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0986199 A2 20000315; EP 0986199 A3 20030625; EP 0986199 B1 20060809; DE 69932681 D1 20060921; DE 69932681 T2 20070802; JP 2000091934 A 20000331

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150909

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160531

2016-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150909

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69932681

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140919

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-16 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 69932681

- Effective date: 20120614

2012-07-25 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20120703

2007-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070510

2007-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69932681 P 20060921

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-08-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041021

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04H 1/00 A

2003-05-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04B 1/16 B

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI