Global patent index - EP 0986287 A2

EP 0986287 A2 2000-03-15 - Two exits switching circuit,its circuit, and its control process of power delivered to the switching circuit exits

Title (en)

Two exits switching circuit,its circuit, and its control process of power delivered to the switching circuit exits

Title (de)

Umkehrschaltkreis mit zwei Ausgängen und Stromkreis und Verfahren der zur Kontrolle der in die Ausgänge des Umkehrschalters eingespeisten Leistung

Title (fr)

Circuit de commutation à deux sorties, son circuit électrique et son procédé de commande de la puissance fournie aux sorties du circuit de commutation

Publication

EP 0986287 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99117713 A

Priority

ES 9801895 A

Abstract (en)

The inversion circuit has two outputs and contains an asymmetrical three-phase H bridge, defined by a common branch and two mutually independent branches contg. power semiconductors (S1-S6) and two changeover switches (R1,R2). The switches change the topology when activated to supply one of the loads independently or both simultaneously. An arrangement (C1,C2) for reducing the current is connected between each load and the common branch in the power semiconducting stage. Independent claims are also included for a circuit and method for monitoring the power supplied to the loads connected to the two outputs.

Abstract (de)

Mittel umfassend, um die eingespeiste Leistung zu regulieren, wobei die Breite des Impulses, der auf Leistungshalbleiter (S1-S6) angelegt wird, gesteuert wird und Mittel, um den Zustand von zwei Umschaltern (R1, R2) einer Brücke aus dreiphasigem H zu steuern, um eine einzige Ladung oder beide Ladungen gleichzeitig zu versorgen. Der Kontrollkreislauf umfaßt Mittel zur Erzeugung von Stromreferenzen (3, 4 und 4'), die proportional zur gewählten Leistung erzeugen (I1 und I2). Er umfaßt Vergleichsmittel (5, 5') von (I1 und I2) mit dem Strom der Ladung (IB1, IB2), um einen Impuls (P1, P2) zu erzeugen, dessen Dauer gleich der Zeit ist, während der (IB1 oder IB2) sie höher als (I1, I2) ist. Ausgehend von diesem Impuls wird die Leistung gesteuert. Die Umschalter (R1, R2) werden nur dann aktiviert, wenn eine Ladung (B1, B2) aktiviert oder deaktiviert wird. Wenn eine einzige Spule Leistung erfordert, werden die Leistungshalbleiter und die Umschalter geteilt. Das Verfahren aktiviert die Leistungshalbleiter gemäß einer Stromkontrolle der Löschung der einpoligen Spannung bei konstanter Frequenz, mit der Besonderheit, daß, wenn die zwei Spulen gleichzeitig Leistung erfordern, diese mit identischer Frequenz versorgt werden. Er ist vorzugsweise für Induktionsküchen anzuwenden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/065 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0986287 A2 20000315; EP 0986287 A3 20000809; ES 2143430 A1 20000501; ES 2143430 B1 20001216

INPADOC legal status

2007-01-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060630

2001-07-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL

2001-07-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB NL

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB NL

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB NL

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI