Global Patent Index - EP 0986310 A1

EP 0986310 A1 2000-03-22 - CONFECTION WITH MULTIPLE JUICY REGIONS AND METHODS FOR MAKING THE SAME

Title (en)

CONFECTION WITH MULTIPLE JUICY REGIONS AND METHODS FOR MAKING THE SAME

Title (de)

SUESSWARE MIT VERSCHIEDENEN SAFTIGEN BEREICHEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

ARTICLE DE CONFISERIE A PLUSIEURS ZONES JUTEUSES ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0986310 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98925158 A

Priority

  • US 9811254 W
  • US 86890797 A
  • US 7623998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9854977A1] A confection (20) containing a continuous region (22) and multiple juicy regions (21) immobilized in the continuous region (22). The juicy regions (21) are formed from water absorbing pellets through the absorption of moisture from the surrounding continuous region (22). The juicy regions (21) deliver enhanced flavor, juiciness in the mouth and unique textures upon consumption of the confection (20). A method is also described for making the confection (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23G 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23G 3/00 (2006.01); A23G 3/20 (2006.01); A23G 3/44 (2006.01); A23G 3/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23G 3/44 (2013.01); A23G 3/2015 (2013.01); A23G 3/34 (2013.01); A23G 3/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854977 A1 19981210; AU 7717298 A 19981221; EP 0986310 A1 20000322; EP 0986310 A4 20010110

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030103

2001-01-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001127

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 23G 3/00 A, 7A 23G 3/20 B

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SUTTLE, JAMES, M.

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: STEET, JOYCE, ANNE

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KAHN, PETER, A.

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KASHULINES, PETER, T., JR.

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RENKEN, SHELLY, A.

2000-04-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BOUSHELL, ROBERT

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991216

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 19991216;LT PAYMENT 19991216;LV PAYMENT 19991216;MK PAYMENT 19991216;RO PAYMENT 19991216;SI PAYMENT 19991216