Global Patent Index - EP 0986359 A1

EP 0986359 A1 2000-03-22 - BEDPAN WITH HORIZONTAL PLATE

Title (en)

BEDPAN WITH HORIZONTAL PLATE

Title (de)

BETTPFANNE MIT HORIZONTALEN LÖFFEL

Title (fr)

BASSIN DE LIT A PELLE HORIZONTALE

Publication

EP 0986359 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98928417 A

Priority

  • FR 9801110 W
  • FR 9707198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2764187A1] The invention concerns a sanitary device or bedpan, for receiving bedridden patients' evacuations, characterised in that it comprises a front part or "plate" (1) arranged horizontally in front of an oblique support plane of the bedpan (2) and forming with it an angle of 120 DEG to 160 DEG open above and in front at the transverse joint (3) in the longitudinal plane. Such an arrangement enables the bedpan to be slid horizontally under the patient's breech without his having to be raised.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 9/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855069A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2764187 A1 19981211; FR 2764187 B1 19991015; AT 232077 T 20030215; CA 2295155 A1 19981210; DE 69811226 D1 20030313; EP 0986359 A1 20000322; EP 0986359 B1 20030205; JP 2002502285 A 20020122; WO 9855069 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CADIC PIERRE

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-08-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-08-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030205

2003-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-05-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-05-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030505

2003-05-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030505

2003-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69811226 P 20030313

2003-02-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES GB IT NL SE

2003-02-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030205

2003-02-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030205

2003-02-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030205

2003-02-05 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030205

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011102

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000104

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES GB IT NL SE