Global Patent Index - EP 0986369 A1

EP 0986369 A1 2000-03-22 - SURFACTANT COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

SURFACTANT COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

TENSIDZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DE TENSIOACTIFS

Publication

EP 0986369 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98924470 A

Priority

  • GB 9801568 W
  • GB 9711786 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9855088A1] Organic solvent free co-polymeric surfactants of the formula: A - B - A where each A is an oligo- or polyester residue of a hydroxycarboxylic acid and B is a polyoxyalkylene chain (both as defined) are useful in personal care water-in-oil emulsion, particularly for emulsions where the aqueous phase includes dissolved electrolyte, urea or alcohols or for hydrophile-in-oil emulsions or dispersion having polyol or aqueous polyol solution hydrophile phase. The hydrophile-in-oil emulsions can be formulated as multiple hydrophile-in-oil-in-water emulsions. The invention includes a single step process for oil-in-water emulsions containing water-in-oil droplets by forming a mixture of an oil phase and oil-in-water primary (oil in water) emulsifier including also the copolymer surfactant and adding to the oil mixture under stirring to an aqueous phase. In particular the primary emulsifier is a combination of a hydrophilic fatty alcohol ethoxylate surfactant and a hydrophobic fatty alcohol ethoxylate surfactant and especially including added fatty alcohol.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/06 (2006.01); A61K 8/72 (2006.01); A61K 8/04 (2006.01); A61K 8/20 (2006.01); A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/36 (2006.01); A61K 8/37 (2006.01); A61K 8/39 (2006.01); A61K 8/40 (2006.01); A61K 8/85 (2006.01); A61K 8/86 (2006.01); A61K 8/90 (2006.01); A61Q 15/00 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); C08K 5/00 (2006.01); C08L 67/04 (2006.01); C08L 71/00 (2006.01); C08L 71/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); A61K 8/066 (2013.01); A61K 8/90 (2013.01); A61Q 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855088A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9855088 A1 19981210; AU 7666898 A 19981221; EP 0986369 A1 20000322; GB 9711786 D0 19970806; JP H1112125 A 19990119

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-24 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A61K0007480000

- IPC: A61K0008900000

- Effective date: 20140613

2014-06-13 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Ref Legal Event Code: R079

- Free Format Text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A61K0007480000

- IPC: A61K0008900000

2014-05-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20131029

2013-03-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61K 8/06 20060101AFI20130128BHEP

2013-03-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61Q 19/00 20060101ALI20130128BHEP

2013-03-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: A61K 8/90 20060101ALI20130128BHEP

2008-08-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-02-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CRODA INTERNATIONAL PLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020729

2003-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020729

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991115

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE