Global Patent Index - EP 0986397 A1

EP 0986397 A1 2000-03-22 - USE OF LEPTIN ANTAGONISTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DIABET

Title (en)

USE OF LEPTIN ANTAGONISTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DIABET

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON LEPTINANTAGONISTEN FÜR BEHANDLUNG VON DIABETEN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'ANTAGONISTES DE LEPTINE POUR TRAITER LE DIABETE

Publication

EP 0986397 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97923840 A

Priority

EP 9702240 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9855139A1] The use of an antagonist of leptin for the manufacture of a medicament for the treatment of disorders resulting from deficiencies in insulin secretion, hyperglycaemia and insulin resistance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/22; C07K 16/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61P 3/08 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/28 (2013.01); A61K 38/2264 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855139A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9855139 A1 19981210; AU 2951797 A 19981221; CA 2293504 A1 19981210; EP 0986397 A1 20000322; HU 0003428 A2 20010528; HU 0003428 A3 20011228; IL 133136 D0 20010319; JP 2002504102 A 20020205; KR 20010013414 A 20010226; TR 9902980 T2 20000522

INPADOC legal status


2007-01-12 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1027742

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-07-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030103

2001-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 38/22 A, 7C 07K 16/28 B, 7A 61P 3/10 B, 7A 61P 5/50 B

2001-11-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: USE OF LEPTIN ANTAGONISTS FOR THE TREATMENT OF DIABETES

2000-09-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000728

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991124

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19991124