Global Patent Index - EP 0986398 A1

EP 0986398 A1 2000-03-22 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF VACCINES AGAINST CELL SURFACE PROTEINS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF VACCINES AGAINST CELL SURFACE PROTEINS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON IMPFSTOFFEN GEGEN ZELLOBERFLÄCHEN-PROTEINEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE VACCINS DIRIGES CONTRE DES PROTEINES DE SURFACES CELLULAIRES

Publication

EP 0986398 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98908558 A

Priority

  • US 9802913 W
  • US 80614797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9836771A1] A method for identifying the repertoire of proteins exposed on the surface of a virus, bacterium or cell, and to the preparation of vaccines thereto. The method includes vectorially labelling proteins on the membrane surface; isolating the labelled membrane surface proteins by two dimensional gel electrophoresis; and sequencing the isolated membrane surface proteins. Also included are methods of producing a vaccine against the virus, bacterium or cell, methods of detecting infertility, methods of producing contraception and the vaccines and contraceptives produced by the methods.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/00; A61K 39/395; C07K 14/705; C07K 16/28; C12N 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/68 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 15/16 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/28 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); G01N 27/447 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/705 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9836771 A1 19980827; AU 6656398 A 19980909; AU 743703 B2 20020131; BR 9807774 A 20000321; CA 2282859 A1 19980827; EP 0986398 A1 20000322; EP 0986398 A4 20021002; HU 0002281 A2 20001128; HU 0002281 A3 20041028; IL 131297 D0 20010128; JP 2001514743 A 20010911; KR 20000075624 A 20001226; PL 335483 A1 20000425

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050329

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031007

2002-10-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020816

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE UNIVERSITY OF VIRGINIA PATENT FOUNDATION

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990923

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE