Global Patent Index - EP 0986423 A1

EP 0986423 A1 2000-03-22 - MONOSKI BINDING

Title (en)

MONOSKI BINDING

Title (de)

SNOWBOARD-EINSTEIGBINDUNG

Title (fr)

FIXATION POUR MONOSKI

Publication

EP 0986423 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99945677 A

Priority

  • DE 9901047 W
  • DE 29806599 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2294088A1] The invention relates to a snowboard binding with shoe retaining elements which cooperate with the longitudinal sides of the shoe sole. A shoe retaining element configured in the shape of a jaw can be pivoted between two limit positions and actuated by means of an opening lever. The aim of the invention is to ensure that the shoe retaining element can be securely locked even when there is snow under the sole and at the same time to prevent the retaining element from opening unintentionally. To this end the pivoting retaining element is embodied as a two-armed lever, whose one arm is configured as the opening lever and the other arm as a twist lock. The twist lock is held by the force of a spring across two curves starting at a summit and against a locking bolt, a detent cavity being inserted in between.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/00 (2006.01); A63C 10/10 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952608A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29806599 U1 19980716; AT 230289 T 20030115; CA 2294088 A1 19991021; CA 2294088 C 20061024; EP 0986423 A1 20000322; EP 0986423 B1 20030102; JP 2002510237 A 20020402; JP 3858117 B2 20061213; US 6302428 B1 20011016; WO 9952608 A1 19991021

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160423

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160423

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-09-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903900 P 20030206

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 230289 T 20030115

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JAPANA CO., LTD.

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991224

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI