Global Patent Index - EP 0986442 A1

EP 0986442 A1 2000-03-22 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPLYING AN OPTIMISED QUANTITY OF CATALYST TO A CORE SHOOTING MACHINE

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SUPPLYING AN OPTIMISED QUANTITY OF CATALYST TO A CORE SHOOTING MACHINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR VERSORGUNG MIT EINEM OPTIMIERTEN KATALISATORMENGE EINER KERNFORMMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR UNE QUANTITE OPTIMALE DE CATALYSEUR A UNE MACHINE A TIRER LES NOYAUX

Publication

EP 0986442 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98922962 A

Priority

  • DE 19723314 A
  • GB 9801509 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9855249A1] In a method and apparatus for the supply of an optimised quantity of catalyst to a core shooting machine for the manufacture of cores or moulds for casting processes wherein a catalyst is extracted from a pressurised vessel (11) in liquid or gaseous form and is mixed with a purging gas before it is introduced into the core shooting machine, firstly an optimised quantity of catalyst and secondly the purging gas at a pressure of 0.1 to 10 bar are fed into a pressure container (15), the catalyst and purging gas are mixed in the pressure container (15), and the resulting mixture is introduced into the core shooting machine. When the catalyst is used in liquid form it can be transformed from the liquid to the gaseous form in metering bellows (20) located between and connected to the pressurised vessel (15) and the pressure container (15).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/123 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855249A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9855249 A1 19981210; AR 015384 A1 20010502; AT 234698 T 20030415; AU 741268 B2 20011129; AU 7542198 A 19981221; BR 9809723 A 20000711; CA 2293507 A1 19981210; CN 1265614 A 20000906; DE 19723314 C1 19990218; EP 0986442 A1 20000322; EP 0986442 B1 20030319; JP 2002502317 A 20020122; KR 20010013424 A 20010226; TR 9902962 T2 20000522; TW 396075 B 20000701; ZA 9804468 B 19981201

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110522

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-02-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120131

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110522

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100525

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100329

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2004-03-10 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-21 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030621

2003-06-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030620

2003-06-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-05-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69812354 P 20030424

2003-04-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030319

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020212

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991130

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE