Global Patent Index - EP 0986454 A1

EP 0986454 A1 2000-03-22 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CROSS-PERFORATING A MOVING PAPER STRIP

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CROSS-PERFORATING A MOVING PAPER STRIP

Title (de)

VERFAHREN SOWIE EINRICHTUNG ZUM QUERPERFORIEREN EINER LAUFENDEN PAPIERBAHN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PERFORER TRANSVERSALEMENT UNE BANDE DE PAPIER EN DEFILEMENT

Publication

EP 0986454 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98934865 A

Priority

  • DE 9801542 W
  • DE 19723750 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9855278A1] The invention relates to a device for cross-perforating a moving paper strip (1) enabling selected perforation holes to be made in the paper strip as it moves (1). This is achieved by providing a perforating cylinder (2) in two cylinders (2, 3) which can be placed on the paper strip. Said perforating cylinder has interspaced retractable punch stamps (19) forming a helicoidal line on its circumference.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26F 3/02; B26F 1/04; B41F 13/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/54 (2006.01); B26D 1/40 (2006.01); B26F 1/04 (2006.01); B26F 1/10 (2006.01); B26F 1/18 (2006.01); B26F 3/00 (2006.01); B26F 3/02 (2006.01); B41F 13/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/10 (2013.01); B26F 1/04 (2013.01); B26F 3/002 (2013.01); B26F 3/02 (2013.01); B41F 13/60 (2013.01); Y10T 83/0481 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4708 (2015.04); Y10T 83/4827 (2015.04); Y10T 83/9408 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855278A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9855278 A1 19981210; CN 1101300 C 20030212; CN 1259072 A 20000705; EP 0986454 A1 20000322; EP 0986454 B1 20011107; ES 2165690 T3 20020316; JP 2000512221 A 20000919; JP 3378018 B2 20030217; US 6289777 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080609

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080608

2009-08-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080609

2009-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080608

2009-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080630

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-04-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080608

2009-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-06-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-10-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165690 T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802074 20011213

2001-11-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011107

2001-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991224

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI