Global Patent Index - EP 0986463 A1

EP 0986463 A1 2000-03-22 - Sheet complex useful for surface coating of moulded structures

Title (en)

Sheet complex useful for surface coating of moulded structures

Title (de)

Mehrschichtige Folie für die Oberflächenbeschichtung von Formkörpern

Title (fr)

Complexe en feuille utilisable pour réaliser le revêtement de surface de structures moulées

Publication

EP 0986463 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98928360 A

Priority

  • FR 9801051 W
  • FR 9706913 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2763885A1] The invention concerns a sheet complex useful for surface coating of moulded structures, in particular those moulded by low pressure injection of thermoplastic substance, comprising a planar structure (9) designed to constitute the final element skin, combined with an underlayer designed to adhere with the injected substance. The invention is characterised in that said underlayer consists of a textile lap (10) or (15) based on fibres resistant to a temperature higher than the injecting temperature, the bonding with the planar structure reverse side resulting from the use of a film based on a thermoplastic composition, compatible with both constituents of the complex and said lap forming a thermal barrier during the injecting phase and an adhesive coating with the injected substance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B32B 27/06; B29C 43/18; B29C 44/14; B32B 27/12; B32B 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 45/14 (2006.01); B32B 5/02 (2006.01); B32B 27/12 (2006.01); B32B 37/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B32B 37/153 (2013.01); B29C 45/14811 (2013.01); B32B 5/02 (2013.01); B29C 2045/14844 (2013.01); B29K 2713/00 (2013.01); B29K 2715/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9853990A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2763885 A1 19981204; FR 2763885 B1 19990625; DE 69821478 D1 20040311; DE 69821478 T2 20041223; EP 0986463 A1 20000322; EP 0986463 B1 20040204; ES 2212301 T3 20040716; PT 986463 E 20040430; WO 9853990 A1 19981203

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100527

2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100526

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100531

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100526

2011-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2011-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100526

2010-12-07 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2010-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: TEXTILES ET PLASTIQUES *CHOMARAT

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090505

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090609

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090512

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212301 T3

2004-05-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-03-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69821478 P 20040311

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL PT SE

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040204

2003-08-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SHEET COMPLEX USEFUL FOR SURFACE COATING OF MOULDED STRUCTURES

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030512

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991110

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT NL PT SE