Global Patent Index - EP 0986469 A1

EP 0986469 A1 2000-03-22 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ENGRAVING MEMBER

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ENGRAVING MEMBER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES GRAVIERORGANS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN ORGANE DE GRAVURE

Publication

EP 0986469 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98934806 A

Priority

  • DE 9801445 W
  • DE 19723184 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19723184A1] The invention relates to a method for operating an engraving member in an electronic engraving machine to engrave printing forms, especially printing cylinders for intaglio printing. A burin of the engraving member is controlled by an engraving signal and engraves a sequence of cups arranged in a gravure screen in the rotating printing cylinder. The engraving signal is formed by superimposing the image signal representing the tonalities to be engraved. In order to obtain good quality engraving, the engraving member is heated to a temperature that is close to operating temperature before engraving starts and/or during an interruption of engraving. To this end, the engraving member is impinged upon by a periodic signal whose frequency is preferably located inside the ultrasonic range in order to avoid noise disturbances.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/045

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/045 (2006.01); B44B 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855305A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19723184 A1 19981210; DE 19723184 B4 20060112; CN 1261307 A 20000726; EP 0986469 A1 20000322; EP 0986469 B1 20011219; ES 2167917 T3 20020516; JP 2000512941 A 20001003; JP 3149193 B2 20010326; US 6741369 B1 20040525; WO 9855305 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050527

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-02-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2003-01-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020527

2003-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020528

2002-05-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2167917 T3

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020321

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802547 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI