Global Patent Index - EP 0986474 B1

EP 0986474 B1 2002-09-18 - HEAT SENSITIVE PRINTING PLATE PRECURSORS

Title (en)

HEAT SENSITIVE PRINTING PLATE PRECURSORS

Title (de)

WÄRMEEMPFINDLICHE DRUCKPLATTEN-VORSTUFE

Title (fr)

PRECURSEURS DE PLANCHES D'IMPRESSION THERMOSENSIBLES

Publication

EP 0986474 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98936319 A

Priority

  • EP 9803484 W
  • GB 9711383 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2325885A] A lithographic printing plate precursor comprises a grained and anodised aluminium substrate coated with a metallic layer, preferably a silver layer, on top of which is applied a transparent cover sheet or layer of material. Imagewise exposure of the precursor by means of a high intensity laser beam allows for the direct provision of press ready plates showing high image quality, good press properties and high durability on press without the requirement for the use of intermediate film and developer chemistry. The transparent cover sheet or layer of material enables the loosely bound debris which is produced in the exposed areas on imagewise exposure to be trapped, and thereby prevented from being released to the atmosphere. Specified sheets are polyolefines and polyethylene terephthalate and specified layers are polyvinyl alcohol, polyvinyl phosphonic acid, polyethylene glycol, gum arabic and carboxymethylcellulose.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10; B41N 1/08; B41N 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41N 1/08 (2006.01); B41N 1/14 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1033 (2013.01); B41N 1/086 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0628409 A1 19941214 - AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

GB 2325885 A 19981209; GB 9811828 D0 19980729; DE 69808078 D1 20021024; EP 0986474 A1 20000322; EP 0986474 B1 20020918; GB 9711383 D0 19970730; JP 2002502331 A 20020122; WO 9855311 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-06-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040603

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-04-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030424

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-02 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20030311

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-19 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808078 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000912

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL