Global Patent Index - EP 0986477 A1

EP 0986477 A1 2000-03-22 - DEVICE FOR CUTTING OFF AND CONVEYING STREAKS AND METHOD FOR CUTTING OFF AND TRANSFERRING A THREADING STREAK

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CUTTING OFF AND CONVEYING STREAKS AND METHOD FOR CUTTING OFF AND TRANSFERRING A THREADING STREAK

Title (de)

STREIFENABSCHLAG- UND ÜBERFÜHREINRICHTUNG SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUM ABSCHLAGEN UND ÜBERFÜHREN EINES EINFÄDELSTREIFENS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'AVANCE ET DE TRANSFERT D'UNE BARRE ET PROCEDE D'AVANCE ET DE TRANSFERT D'UNE BARRE D'ENFILAGE

Publication

EP 0986477 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98921410 A

Priority

  • DE 19713540 A
  • EP 9801878 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19713540A1] The invention relates to a device for cutting off and conveying streaks, for a machine. The device is used for producing a continuous web, especially of paper or card, for a threading streak, and has a knife. Finally, the device is characterized in that it has at least one (preferably driven) guiding roll (27) which can be brought into engagement with the threading streak (27).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/03; B65H 20/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 9/0063 (2013.01); Y10S 83/909 (2013.01); Y10S 83/949 (2013.01); Y10T 83/0453 (2015.04); Y10T 83/0581 (2015.04); Y10T 83/0605 (2015.04); Y10T 83/2066 (2015.04); Y10T 83/2074 (2015.04); Y10T 83/2094 (2015.04); Y10T 83/2196 (2015.04); Y10T 83/2198 (2015.04); Y10T 83/5733 (2015.04); Y10T 83/6651 (2015.04); Y10T 83/6654 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9843815A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19713540 A1 19981008; AT 244143 T 20030715; EP 0986477 A1 20000322; EP 0986477 B1 20030702; US 6474205 B1 20021105; WO 9843815 A1 19981008

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2008-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2006-04-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060419

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060418

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-18 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060418

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-04-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060413

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040405

2003-08-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808916 P 20030807

2003-07-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991102

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE