Global Patent Index - EP 0986505 A1

EP 0986505 A1 2000-03-22 - FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSER WITH SNAP-ON FIXING RING

Title (en)

FLUID PRODUCT DISPENSER WITH SNAP-ON FIXING RING

Title (de)

SPENDER FÜR FLIESSFÄHIGES MATERIAL MIT SCHNAPP-BEFESTIGUNGSRING

Title (fr)

DISTRIBUTEUR DE PRODUIT FLUIDE A BAGUE DE FIXATION ENCLIQUETABLE

Publication

EP 0986505 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98929544 A

Priority

  • FR 9801195 W
  • FR 9707317 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2764584A1] The invention concerns a fixing device for a fluid product dispenser adaptable on a reservoir (1) formed with a neck (10) and comprising a dispensing member (2) mounted on the reservoir (1) neck (10), said neck (10) forming an outer peripheral thickness (11) defining with the rest of the neck a lower shoulder (12), said fixing device comprising a fixing ring (20) to fix the dispensing member on the neck, the fixing ring (20) comprising a peripheral skirt (21) extending up to beneath said shoulder (12). The invention is characterised in that said skirt (21) is provided with flaps (22) the ends of which point inwards and upwards and are urged in stop contact against the shoulder (12) thereby providing a catching mechanism for the fixing ring (20) on the reservoir (1) neck (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3049 (2013.01); B65D 83/38 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2764584 A1 19981218; FR 2764584 B1 19990820; DE 69802681 D1 20020110; DE 69802681 T2 20021002; DE 69802681 T3 20071206; EP 0986505 A1 20000322; EP 0986505 B1 20011128; EP 0986505 B2 20070328; ES 2168767 T3 20020616; ES 2168767 T5 20071116; US 2002104853 A1 20020808; US 6315169 B1 20011113; US 6527148 B2 20030304; WO 9856688 A1 19981217

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150612

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150612

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69802681

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

2014-11-27 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20141121

2014-11-04 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20141029

2013-09-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69802681

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130729

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69802681

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130729

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69802681

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69802681

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-09-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69802681

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: STAUDT IP LAW, DE

- Effective date: 20130729

2013-07-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69802681

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

2013-07-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69802681

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BITTNER & PARTNER, DE

2013-02-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20130104

2007-11-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2007-07-18 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

2007-03-28 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20070328

2007-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2007-01-19 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1026882

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2006-05-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: REXAM DISPENSING SYSTEMS

- Effective date: 20020826

2005-06-08 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: REXAM SOFAB

- Effective date: 20020826

2004-06-02 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VALOIS S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-01-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: REXAM SOFAB

- Effective date: 20020826

2003-02-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-10-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: REXAM SOFAB

- Effective date: 20020826

2002-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020630

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2168767

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69802681

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-11-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010419

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991231

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI