Global Patent Index - EP 0986509 A1

EP 0986509 A1 2000-03-22 - CONTACT ROLLER SYSTEM OF A WINDING MACHINE

Title (en)

CONTACT ROLLER SYSTEM OF A WINDING MACHINE

Title (de)

KONTAKTWALZENSYSTEM EINER WICKELMASCHINE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CYLINDRES CONTACTEURS D'UNE ENROULEUSE

Publication

EP 0986509 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99904824 A

Priority

  • DE 19805412 A
  • EP 9900559 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19805412A1] Known contact roller systems of winding machines for winding running webs (1) of material such as paper or plastic films have several freely rotating roller segments (3, 3') which are mounted end to end adjacently to each other and which can move perpendicularly to their axis of rotation (11). According to the invention, each roller segment (3, 3') is held by a frame which moves perpendicularly to the axis of rotation (11). Each frame of a roller segment (3, 3') contains two side support plates (5, 5). Said support plates extend parallel to the ends of the roller segments and the adjacent support plates (5, 5') of two roller segments (3, 3') are located one above the other, perpendicular to the direction of movement. The support plates (5, 5) preferably have deep ring-shaped grooves (16) in which the end surfaces of the roller segments (3, 3') can rotate without contact. This arrangement enables each roller segment (3, 3') to be individually pressed against a winding roll (2) whilst keeping the gap between adjacent roller segments (3, 3') very small to avoid marks on the winding rolls (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/26; B65H 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/26 (2013.01); B65H 2301/414322 (2013.01); B65H 2301/4148 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1321 (2013.01); B65H 2404/431 (2013.01); B65H 2601/211 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941174A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19805412 A1 19990812; EP 0986509 A1 20000322; EP 0986509 B1 20030423; ES 2196768 T3 20031216; JP 2001524917 A 20011204; US 6182919 B1 20010206; WO 9941174 A1 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090128

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090129

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090202

2010-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090129

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091030

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080111

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-02-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196768 T3

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905156 P 20030528

2003-05-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011107

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990727

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT