Global Patent Index - EP 0986510 A1

EP 0986510 A1 2000-03-22 - DEVICE FOR MONITORING SHEETS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR MONITORING SHEETS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONTROLLIEREN VON BÖGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE CONTROLER DES FEUILLES

Publication

EP 0986510 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910342 A

Priority

  • DE 29804960 U
  • EP 9901655 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2290634A1] The invention relates to a device for monitoring sheets from which cards with a monetary value and/or identity cards are punched, said cards being arranged in rows on the sheets. Devices of this type are not very flexible to use since each row of cards requires its own camera. The aim of the invention is to configure the device in such a way that the number of cameras used is independent of the number of rows of cards. To this end, the inventive device has a table (1) on which at least two sheets (15) can be laid. A camera (14) can be moved along and across said table (1) and a conveyor device (9) travels along the table (1), above the same.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 43/08; B41F 13/00; B41F 33/00; B65H 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 7/14 (2013.01); B65H 2511/413 (2013.01); B65H 2511/512 (2013.01); B65H 2511/52 (2013.01); B65H 2553/42 (2013.01); B65H 2553/80 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B65H 2511/413 + B65H 2220/01
  2. B65H 2511/512 + B65H 2220/02
  3. B65H 2511/52 + B65H 2220/03

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948784A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29804960 U1 19990107; CA 2290634 A1 19990930; EP 0986510 A1 20000322; EP 0986510 B1 20021113; US 6264420 B1 20010724; WO 9948784 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-09-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030919

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903377 20021219

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011102

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991016

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT