Global Patent Index - EP 0986567 A1

EP 0986567 A1 2000-03-22 - PURE ENANTIOMER METALLOCENE COMPLEXES AND THE PRODUCTION AND USE OF THE SAME

Title (en)

PURE ENANTIOMER METALLOCENE COMPLEXES AND THE PRODUCTION AND USE OF THE SAME

Title (de)

ENANTIOMERENREINE METALLOCENKOMPLEXE, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

COMPLEXES METALLOCENES EXEMPTS D'ENANTIOMERES, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0986567 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925604 A

Priority

  • DE 19720592 A
  • DE 19800394 A
  • EP 9802858 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9852956A1] The invention relates to a method for producing pure enantiomer metallocene complexes from the archiral meso-form or the racemate of the corresponding metallocene complex or a mixture of the two in the presence of a pure enantiomer auxiliary reagent, using heat. The invention also relates to pure enantiomer metallocene complexes and their use in stereoselective synthesis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07F 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07F 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07F 17/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9852956A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9852956 A1 19981126; EP 0986567 A1 20000322

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030124

2002-09-25 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PRODUCTION OF PURE ENANTIOMER METALLOCENE COMPLEXES

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MCAT GMBH

2002-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MCAT GMBH

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010726

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991209

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI