Global Patent Index - EP 0986596 A1

EP 0986596 A1 2000-03-22 - BIODEGRADABLE POLYESTER URETHANES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF

Title (en)

BIODEGRADABLE POLYESTER URETHANES, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION AND USE THEREOF

Title (de)

BIOABBAUBARE POLYESTERURETHANE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG SOWIE IHRE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

POLYESTERURETHANES BIODEGRADABLES, LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION AINSI QUE LEUR UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0986596 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936105 A

Priority

  • DE 9801539 W
  • DE 19723895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19723895A1] The invention relates to biodegradable linear polyester urethanes and to biodegradable cross-linked polyester urethanes obtained from linear polyester urethanes by virtue of the fact that they are cross-linked by diisocyanate bridges. By varying the degree of crosslinking, the physical, chemical and biological properties of the inventive cross-linked polyester urethane can be adjusted and the biodegradability thereof can also be varied considering that biological degradability occurs more slowly as the degree of crosslinking increases. The invention also relates to a method for producing the inventive polyester urethanes and to the use thereof as films, rubber bodies, containers, packaging materials and in galenical preparations, as adhesives, adhesive strips and the like. The invention also relates to polymer blends containing the inventive polyurethanes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08G 18/42; C08G 63/06; C08G 63/78; C08G 63/85; C08G 63/91

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/34 (2006.01); A61K 9/20 (2006.01); A61K 9/32 (2006.01); A61K 9/48 (2006.01); A61L 17/00 (2006.01); A61L 27/00 (2006.01); C08G 18/42 (2006.01); C08L 75/08 (2006.01); C08L 101/16 (2006.01); C09D 175/06 (2006.01); C09J 175/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 18/4277 (2013.01); C09J 175/06 (2013.01); C08G 2230/00 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31551 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31591 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855527A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19723895 A1 19981210; DE 19723895 C2 19990602; AU 8529998 A 19981221; CA 2292564 A1 19981210; EP 0986596 A1 20000322; IL 133328 D0 20010430; JP 2002504939 A 20020212; KR 20010013503 A 20010226; US 6228969 B1 20010508; WO 9855527 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-06 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20010921

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010323

2000-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELBE TECHNOLOGIES LTD

2000-05-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEE, YOON JICK

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000107

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE