Global Patent Index - EP 0986631 A1

EP 0986631 A1 2000-03-22 - LOW-FOAM DETERGENT

Title (en)

LOW-FOAM DETERGENT

Title (de)

SCHAUMARMES REINIGUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

DETERGENT FAIBLEMENT MOUSSANT

Publication

EP 0986631 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98937430 A

Priority

  • DE 19723990 A
  • EP 9803223 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19723990A1] The invention relates to a detergent concentrate containing glycol ether and cationic surfactants. It is characterized in that it contains less than 0.1 wt. % fatty alcohol polyglycol ether and/or amphoteric surfactants, and that it contains a) glycol ether of general formula R-O-(CH2-CH(CH3)-O)n-H, in which R is an alkyl radical with 1-4 C-atoms or a phenyl radical, and n is a number between 1 and 5, and b) cationic surfactants. The weight ratio of a) to b) is between 8:1 and 100:1.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/43; C11D 1/62; C11D 1/835

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/43 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 1/835 (2006.01); C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/835 (2013.01); C11D 3/0026 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855578A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19723990 A1 19981210; AR 012941 A1 20001122; AT 210718 T 20011215; AU 726452 B2 20001109; AU 8623998 A 19981221; BR 9810413 A 20000822; CA 2293524 A1 19981210; CN 1259164 A 20000705; CZ 289755 B6 20020313; CZ 9904371 A3 20010117; EP 0986631 A1 20000322; EP 0986631 B1 20011212; ES 2169536 T3 20020701; HU 0003711 A2 20010228; JP 2002508794 A 20020319; KR 20010013301 A 20010226; PL 337232 A1 20000814; TR 9902907 T2 20000522; US 6187737 B1 20010213; WO 9855578 A1 19981210; ZA 9804853 B 19981207

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160512

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050529

2004-07-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040716

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030529

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169536 T3

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-05-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020513

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-03-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802449 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210718 T 20011215

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991127

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE