Global Patent Index - EP 0986658 B1

EP 0986658 B1 2002-09-11 - THERMOTROPIC AROMATIC POLYESTER(AMIDE) MONOFILAMENT

Title (en)

THERMOTROPIC AROMATIC POLYESTER(AMIDE) MONOFILAMENT

Title (de)

MONOFILAMENT AUS AROMATISCHEN THERMOTROPEN POLYESTER(AMIDE)

Title (fr)

MONOFILAMENT EN POLYESTER(AMIDE) AROMATIQUE THERMOTROPE

Publication

EP 0986658 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98932129 A

Priority

  • EP 9803386 W
  • FR 9707142 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9855674A1] The invention concerns a thermotropic aromatic polyester(amide) as-spun monofilament, verifying the following relationships: D >/= 40; Te > 45; DELTA L >/= 0, D being its diameter (in mu m), Te its toughness (in cN/tex), and DELTA L being its variation in length (in %) after 2 minutes at 235 +/- 5 DEG C under prestress of 0.2 cN/tex. The invention also concerns the spinning method for obtaining such a monofilament, consisting in particular, at the die outlet, in structuring the polymer flow by drawing it in a gas fluid layer for a predetermined duration which is a function of the diameter D, before the resulting structured polymer flow is hot-dipped in a liquid for its solidification.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 6/84; D01D 5/088; D01F 6/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60C 9/00 (2006.01); B29D 30/06 (2006.01); C08J 5/04 (2006.01); D01D 5/088 (2006.01); D01F 6/62 (2006.01); D01F 6/82 (2006.01); D01F 6/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/84 (2013.01); D01D 5/088 (2013.01); D01F 6/82 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

WO 9212018 A1 19920723 - MICHELIN RECH TECH [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9855674 A1 19981210; AU 8213998 A 19981221; BR 9809548 A 20000620; CA 2292753 A1 19981210; CN 1123657 C 20031008; CN 1261412 A 20000726; DE 69807871 D1 20021017; DE 69807871 T2 20030508; EP 0986658 A1 20000322; EP 0986658 B1 20020911; JP 2002503295 A 20020129; JP 4010572 B2 20071121; RU 2202012 C2 20030410; TR 199902977 T2 20001023; US 6550507 B1 20030422

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060605

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060605

2005-06-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050613

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050525

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807871 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010907

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000107

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL