Global Patent Index - EP 0986660 A2

EP 0986660 A2 2000-03-22 - WOVEN FABRIC FOR WORK CLOTHING PARTS

Title (en)

WOVEN FABRIC FOR WORK CLOTHING PARTS

Title (de)

GEWEBE FÜR ARBEITSBEKLEIDUNGSSTÜCKE

Title (fr)

TISSU POUR PIECES DE VETEMENT DE TRAVAIL

Publication

EP 0986660 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99917914 A

Priority

  • DE 29805867 U
  • EP 9902169 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2291742A1] Woven fabric element for the production of work clothing parts for protection against the effects of heat, flames and electric arcs, with a frame casing 3/1 consisting of approximately 36 fibers/cm chains and approximately 23 fibers/cm wefts and overall mixtures of chain yarn and weft yarn of approximately 41 % viscose, approximately 30 % to 41 % meta-aramid, approximately 17 to 29 % paramid and approximately 1 % polyamide with a carbon core.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 31/00 (2006.01); A62B 17/00 (2006.01); D03D 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/443 (2013.01); A41D 31/0022 (2013.01); A62B 17/00 (2013.01); D03D 15/12 (2013.01); D10B 2201/24 (2013.01); D10B 2331/02 (2013.01); D10B 2331/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950491A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29805867 U1 19990826; AT 222303 T 20020815; CA 2291742 A1 19991007; DK 0986660 T3 20021216; EP 0986660 A2 20000322; EP 0986660 B1 20020814; PL 192744 B1 20061229; PL 337424 A1 20000814; US 6296023 B1 20011002; WO 9950491 A2 19991007; WO 9950491 A3 19991202

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170406

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130330

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130330

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130331

2013-10-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-10-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2013-10-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20130331

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-24 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-10-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: IBENA TEXTILWERKE BECKMANN GMBH & CO.

- Free text: IBENA TEXTILWERKE BECKMANN GMBH & CO.#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 7-13#46395 BOCHOLT (DE) $ ARAMEX-GARNE GMBH#WEHRDSTRASSE 7#78224 SINGEN (DE) $ HTS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG#BILLBROOKDEICH 216#22113 HAMBURG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- IBENA TEXTILWERKE BECKMANN GMBH & CO.#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 7-13#46395 BOCHOLT (DE) $ ARAMEX-GARNE GMBH#WEHRDSTRASSE 7#78224 SINGEN (DE) $ CWS-BOCO DEUTSCHLAND GMBH#BILLBROOKDEICH 216#22113 HAMBURG (DE)

2006-04-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-07-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: ARAMEX-GARNE GMBH

2004-07-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: HTS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2004-07-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: IBENA TEXTILWERKE BECKMANN GMBH & CO.

2004-05-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: IBENA TEXTILWERKE BECKMANN GMBH & CO.

- Free text: BOCO GMBH & CO.#BILLBROOKDEICH 210#D-22113 HAMBURG (DE) $ IBENA TEXTILWERKE BECKMANN GMBH & CO.#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 7-13#46395 BOCHOLT (DE) $ ARAMEX-GARNE GMBH#WEHRDSTRASSE 7#78224 SINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- IBENA TEXTILWERKE BECKMANN GMBH & CO.#INDUSTRIESTRASSE 7-13#46395 BOCHOLT (DE) $ ARAMEX-GARNE GMBH#WEHRDSTRASSE 7#78224 SINGEN (DE) $ HTS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG#BILLBROOKDEICH 216#22113 HAMBURG (DE)

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-12-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902327 20020919

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 222303 T 20020815

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020125

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000117

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE