Global Patent Index - EP 0986674 A1

EP 0986674 A1 2000-03-22 - STABILIZED TURF FOR ATHLETIC FIELD

Title (en)

STABILIZED TURF FOR ATHLETIC FIELD

Title (de)

STABILISIERTER NATÜRLICHER RASEN FÜR EINEN SPORTPLATZ

Title (fr)

GAZON NATUREL STABILISE POUR TERRAIN D'ATHLETISME

Publication

EP 0986674 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98926198 A

Priority

  • US 9811323 W
  • US 87054197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6094860A] A stabilized turf (10) particularly suitable for athletic fields includes a mat (18) interposed between upper (24) and lower (16) layers of growth media, the mat (18) having a horizontally disposed, biodegradable primary backing (22) and generally upwardly extending fibers (20) secured thereto, wherein the fibers (20) extend above the upper layer (24) of growth media. Natural grass plants (26) extend upwardly above the upper layer (24), with the roots extending down through the backing (22) and into the lower layer (16). The mat (18) stabilizes root growth, particularly during initial grow in. The biodegradability of the primary backing (22) results in a loss of all or most of its horizontal structural integrity within a predetermined time period. The primary backing (22) may be treated with a decomposition agent to control the predetermined time period for decomposition, a stabilizing agent to assist in holding the upright fibers (20) or a growth agent for the natural turf grass. The mat (18) may also include a reinforcement primary backing (122a), to which the fibers (20) may be secured along with the biodegradable primary, or the reinforcement primary could stand alone, above or below the biodegradable primary. Aerating helps to disperse, i.e., reorient and vertically distribute, the fibers (22) within a subsurface vertical band (22a) greater in vertical dimension than the upper layer of growth media. The stabilized turf (10) can also be topdressed. Thus, this turf (10) is adapted to accommodate both aeration and topdressing, two well-recognized and advocated turf management practices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01G 1/00 (2006.01); E01C 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 13/083 (2013.01); A01G 1/002 (2013.01); E01C 2013/086 (2013.01); Y10T 428/23957 (2015.04); Y10T 428/23979 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855697A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

US 6094860 A 20000801; AU 738632 B2 20010920; AU 7809298 A 19981221; CA 2293374 A1 19981210; CA 2293374 C 20070918; DE 69825997 D1 20041007; DE 69825997 T2 20050127; EP 0986674 A1 20000322; EP 0986674 B1 20040901; EP 1394324 A1 20040303; US 6029397 A 20000229; US 6173528 B1 20010116; US 6247267 B1 20010619; WO 9855697 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110608

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100622

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-05-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070608

2008-03-19 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2006-05-25 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060525

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2005-08-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-12-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041212

2004-12-01 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-10-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69825997

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL

2004-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

SI

2004-09-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-09-01 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040901

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020918

2000-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TECHNOLOGY LICENSING CORP.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000105