Global Patent Index - EP 0986675 A1

EP 0986675 A1 2000-03-22 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREVENTING AVALANCHES, SNOW SLIDES OR THE LIKE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PREVENTING AVALANCHES, SNOW SLIDES OR THE LIKE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG DER ENTSTEHUNG VON LAWINEN UND DGL. FLIESSSCHNEE-PHÄNOMENEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LUTTER CONTRE LA FORMATION D'AVALANCHES, COULEES DE NEIGE ET ANALOGUES

Publication

EP 0986675 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98937431 A

Priority

  • DE 19722770 A
  • EP 9803233 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19722770A1] The invention relates to a method and device for preventing avalanches and other snow slides. The snow mass is divided into individual layers, or an existing division is used, and the individual layers are mixed together. This dividing and mixing can take place horizontally and/or vertically, and compacting can take place at the same time. The device consists essentially of a curved retaining bar (3) which is anchored to the slope and bears at least one lifting body (15). Said lifting body is preferably arranged at a given angle to the retaining bar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 7/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855698A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19722770 A1 19981203; AT 215642 T 20020415; CA 2292493 A1 19981210; CA 2292493 C 20040504; EP 0986675 A1 20000322; EP 0986675 B1 20020403; ES 2175743 T3 20021116; JP 2002502471 A 20020122; JP 3652709 B2 20050525; US 6382597 B1 20020507; WO 9855698 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140529

2015-02-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59803624

- Effective date: 20141202

2015-01-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 215642 T

- Effective date: 20140529

2014-12-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59803624

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120530

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130731

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-08-20 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130820

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110530

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120511

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120606

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110529

2012-01-10 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-04-29 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20090601

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100518

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100521

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-08-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20090601

2008-04-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-01-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2007-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALPINTECHNIK AG

- Free text: MUTSCHLER, FRIEDOLF#SIECHBERG 54#88416 OCHSENHAUSEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- ALPINTECHNIK AG#SCHAEFLIGASSE 1#9050 APPENZELL (CH)

2005-05-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050529

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175743 T3

2002-09-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803624 20020508

2002-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR IT LI SE

2002-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 215642 T 20020415

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991125

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR IT LI SE