Global patent index - EP 0986678 A1

EP 0986678 A1 2000-03-22 - MULTPLE JET SHOWER WITH AERATION DEVICE

Title (en)

MULTPLE JET SHOWER WITH AERATION DEVICE

Title (de)

MEHRFACHSTRAHLDUSCHE MIT LUFTZUMISCHUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'AERATION POUR POMME DE DOUCHE A JET VARIABLE

Publication

EP 0986678 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98924810 A

Priority

  • IT TO970481 A
  • US 9810306 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9855704A1] An aerating device (15) for a shower (10) where the shower includes a water chamber (11) having a connection (12) for the supply of pressurized water and having a first perforated plate (13) that forms a wall of the water chamber and that is provided with a plurality of holes (14). Each hole of the first plate is constructed as to project a single jet of water. The aerating device comprises a second perforated plate (16), positioned downstream from the first plate, to make an air chamber (20) between the two plates. The second plate has a plurality of holes (17), each of which is aligned along the direction of projection of the respective jet of water of a corresponding hole (14) of the first plate. An air intake (19) is positioned between the air chamber (20) and the outside environment. The aerating device (15) makes it possible to aerate by way of the Venturi effect, at the outlet of the shower to eliminate any resistance after the jets have been formed for providing a highly efficient device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/28 (2006.01); B05B 7/04 (2006.01); E03C 1/084 (2006.01); B05B 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03C 1/084 (2013.01); B05B 7/0425 (2013.01); B05B 1/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9855704 A1 19981210; WO 9855704 A9 19990408; AU 727334 B2 20001207; AU 7689698 A 19981221; BR 9809934 A 20010918; CA 2292756 A1 19981210; CA 2292756 C 20031202; CN 1105215 C 20030409; CN 1259183 A 20000705; DE 69838907 D1 20080207; DE 69838907 T2 20090108; EP 0986678 A1 20000322; EP 0986678 A4 20010314; EP 0986678 B1 20071226; IT 1293138 B1 19990212; IT TO970481 A1 19981203; IT TO970481 D0 19970603; JP 2000513987 A 20001024; JP 3553087 B2 20040811

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150520

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150520

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69838907

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120510

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080520

2008-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20080929

2008-08-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2008-02-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69838907

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-02-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-12-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2007-12-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040805

2001-03-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010130

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MASCO CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991130

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT