Global patent index - EP 0986680 A1

EP 0986680 A1 2000-03-22 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO CONCRETE STRUCTURES

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO CONCRETE STRUCTURES

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE BETONKONSTRUKTION

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS APPORTEES AUX OUVRAGES EN BETON OU CONCERNANT CE TYPE D'OUVRAGES

Publication

EP 0986680 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97926118 A

Priority

  • GB 9701602 W
  • GB 9614960 A
  • GB 9616989 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9802625A1] Lines of concrete columns (50, 60, 92, 93) are cast simultaneously, already interconnected by two-part metal connectors (20, 31), with a lower part-connector (20) anchored in or to the top of each lower column (50, 60, 92) and with an upper part-connector (31) anchored in or to the bottom of each upper column (60, 92, 93) of the pair. The columns (50, 60, 92, 93) are then disconnected, by disconnecting the metal connectors (20, 31) and are stored in a known order so that they can be subsequently reconnected in the same relationship in a concrete structure having concrete floors; that is, each line of vertical columns (50, 60, 92, 93) in the eventual structure are the same columns (50, 60, 92, 93) as were cast in a line to begin with. In the structure itself, after the first level of columns (50) has been errected, the first concrete floor (56) is laid at the tops of the columns (50), filling a space between the top (55) of each lower column (50) and a plate (21) of the lower part-connector (20), so that the plate (21) is flush with the upper surface (58) of the floor (56) for locating the second column (60) in the line. Then the second level of precast columns (60) is erected, by reconnecting the metal connectrors (20, 31).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/21; B28B 7/00; B28B 7/02; B28B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/21 (2006.01); E04C 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/34 (2013.01); E04B 1/215 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9802625A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR IE NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9802625 A1 19980122; AU 3100297 A 19980209; AU 722320 B2 20000727; DE 69714864 D1 20020926; DE 69714864 T2 20030515; EP 0986680 A1 20000322; EP 0986680 B1 20020821

INPADOC legal status

2015-08-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150609

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-05-30 [PGRI IE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20080219

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2008-04-02 [REG IE NF4A] ORDER MADE FOR RESTORATION SECT. 37 PATENTS ACT 1992

- Ref Legal Event Code: NF4A

- Effective date: 20080219

2007-11-14 [REG IE NE4A] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION SECT. 37 PATENTS ACT 1992

- Ref Legal Event Code: NE4A

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-03-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2007-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070103

2006-06-13 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060613

2005-06-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050609

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-02-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-01-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-09 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Free Format Text: O'ROURKE, RAYMOND GABRIEL, FIDDLERS REACH * BANKS, COLIN RICHARD, TRIMULGHERRY COTTAGE

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69714864

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-26

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IE NL

2002-08-21 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020821

2002-08-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020821

2000-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990216

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IE NL