Global Patent Index - EP 0986681 A1

EP 0986681 A1 2000-03-22 - DEVICE FOR FIXING PLATES, IN PARTICULAR GLASS PLATES

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR FIXING PLATES, IN PARTICULAR GLASS PLATES

Title (de)

PANEELBEFESTIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR VERGLASUNGSPANEELE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION POUR PLAQUES, EN PARTICULIER DES PLAQUES DE VERRE

Publication

EP 0986681 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99937960 A

Priority

  • DE 19809617 A
  • FR 9900487 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9945217A1] The invention concerns a device for fixing plates (1), in particular glass plates, comprising retaining elements (2 to 5) arranged between each plate and a support structure (6), which retaining elements comprise means for compensating the dimensional variations, wherein the deformations and movements between the plate and the support structure, the degrees of freedom in rotation of the compensating means are represented solely by uniaxial pivoting articulations (11, 12). The combined degrees of freedom in translation can be produced inside the very articulations or by installing the articulations movable. By means of said fixing device, plates (1) can be mounted in statically predetermined manner using an appropriate combination of the degrees of freedom.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/88; E04F 13/08; E06B 3/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/90 (2006.01); E04B 2/88 (2006.01); E04F 13/08 (2006.01); E06B 3/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/5445 (2013.01); E04B 2/885 (2013.01); E06B 3/5436 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945217A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9945217 A1 19990910; AT 275680 T 20040915; AU 3258199 A 19990920; AU 755516 B2 20021212; CA 2289563 A1 19990910; CN 1106492 C 20030423; CN 1266467 A 20000913; DE 19809617 A1 19991014; DE 19809617 C2 20000525; DE 69919949 D1 20041014; EP 0986681 A1 20000322; EP 0986681 B1 20040908; JP 2001523314 A 20011120; KR 20010012190 A 20010215; PL 336660 A1 20000703; US 6519903 B1 20030218

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160311

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-03-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2010-01-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050208

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-04-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040908

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-11 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-04 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050304

2005-03-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050302

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-02-16 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DELTA-X GMBH INGENIEURGESELLSCHAFT

2004-12-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041219

2004-12-09 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041209

2004-12-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69919949 P 20041014

2004-10-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-09-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DIRISAMER, WOLFGANG

2004-09-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEOPOLDSEDER, ROLAND

2004-09-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ECKELT, CHRISTIAN

2004-09-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BURMEISTER, ALBRECHT

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030716

2001-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991110

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE