Global Patent Index - EP 0986686 A1

EP 0986686 A1 2000-03-22 - SUPPORT FOR PIVOTING DOOR OF A HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE

Title (en)

SUPPORT FOR PIVOTING DOOR OF A HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE

Title (de)

LAGERUNG FÜR EINE VERSCHWENKBARE TÜR EINES HAUSHALTSGERÄTES

Title (fr)

PORTEE POUR PORTE PIVOTANTE D'UN APPAREIL MENAGER

Publication

EP 0986686 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98930762 A

Priority

  • DE 19723077 A
  • EP 9803219 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19723077A1] The invention relates to a support for a pivoting door of a household appliance, such as a refrigerator, clothes drier or similar, having a bearing element (30) carried by a fastening element (21), and a recess in which the bearing element (30) is rotationally accommodated. Said bearing element (30) has an intermediary (32) which serves as a pivot pin and engages in the recess by lodging in it. The bearing element (30) and the fastening element (21) form a single piece made of a flat material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 5/10; F25D 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/10 (2006.01); F25D 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/028 (2013.01); E05D 5/10 (2013.01); E05D 2005/106 (2013.01); E05Y 2600/522 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/31 (2013.01); F25D 2323/024 (2013.01); F25D 2500/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855719A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19723077 A1 19981203; DE 19723077 B4 20060817; AT 333555 T 20060815; CN 1175162 C 20041110; CN 1259187 A 20000705; DE 59813649 D1 20060831; EP 0986686 A1 20000322; EP 0986686 B1 20060719; ES 2268782 T3 20070316; TR 200000431 T2 20000522; WO 9855719 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160529

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150519

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59813649

- Effective date: 20150402

2011-01-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20110103

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070529

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061020

2007-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070420

2007-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2268782 T3

2007-01-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061219

2006-10-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-10-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813649 P 20060831

2006-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060725

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IT PT SE

2006-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2006-07-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991025

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB GR IT PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19991025