Global Patent Index - EP 0986688 A1

EP 0986688 A1 2000-03-22 - IMPROVED ARTICULATION DEVICE FOR A HATCHBACK MOUNTED ON A MOTOR VEHICLE BODY

Title (en)

IMPROVED ARTICULATION DEVICE FOR A HATCHBACK MOUNTED ON A MOTOR VEHICLE BODY

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE GELENKVORRICHTUNG EINES AN EINER KRAFTFAHRZEUGKAROSSERIE SCHWENKBAR ANGEORDNETEN FLÜGELS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF PERFECTIONNE D'ARTICULATION D'UN OUVRANT MONTE PIVOTANT SUR LA CAISSE D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 0986688 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98929496 A

Priority

  • FR 9801145 W
  • FR 9707056 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2764245A1] The invention concerns an articulation device for a hatchback (22) mounted pivoting on a motor vehicle via a swivel rod (24), and in which means are provided (36) for automatically controlling the hatchback (22) pivoting movement by the pivoting movement of the rod first end (26) relative to the vehicle body structure (12). The invention is characterised in that the hatchback (22) pivoting direction, relative to the rod second end, is reversed during the rod (24) first end (26) pivoting movement between two extreme angular positions associated with extreme closed and open positions of the hatchback.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 15/40; B60J 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 5/10 (2006.01); E05D 15/40 (2006.01); E05D 15/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 15/40 (2013.01); E05D 15/56 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/62 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/716 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/722 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/29 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/546 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855721A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2764245 A1 19981211; FR 2764245 B1 19990730; DE 69801325 D1 20010913; DE 69801325 T2 20020418; EP 0986688 A1 20000322; EP 0986688 B1 20010808; JP 2002504200 A 20020205; US 6234563 B1 20010522; WO 9855721 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2004-06-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040604

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-02-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-09-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69801325 20010913

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-08-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-08-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010808

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991207

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT