Global Patent Index - EP 0986696 A1

EP 0986696 A1 2000-03-22 - VALVE SYSTEM FOR A VALVE-CONTROLLED COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

VALVE SYSTEM FOR A VALVE-CONTROLLED COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VENTILANORDNUNG FÜR EINEN VENTILGESTEUERTEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF A SOUPAPES POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE A COMMANDE PAR SOUPAPES

Publication

EP 0986696 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928335 A

Priority

  • DE 19723923 A
  • EP 9803212 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19723923A1] The invention relates to a valve system for a valve-controlled combustion engine having an electric linear motor (10) which serves as actuator for a valve member. The linear motor has a rotor (16) which is coupled to a valve member (12), and a stator (18). The stator (18) is made of sheet metal (20), the surface of which is perpendicular to the direction (B) of movement of the rotor (16). The stator (18) is fitted with teeth (22) which face towards the rotor (18) and which each have a closed lateral surface facing the rotor (18).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01); H02K 41/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2013.01); F01L 2009/0405 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855741A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19723923 A1 19981210; DE 19723923 C2 20000621; EP 0986696 A1 20000322; EP 0986696 B1 20020327; JP 2002506499 A 20020226; WO 9855741 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2006-07-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060711

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2003-01-03 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-09-25 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803523 20020502

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-03-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-03-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL ISAD ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. OHG

2001-09-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL ISAD ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. OHG

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISAD ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS GMBH & CO.KG

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991110

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT