Global Patent Index - EP 0986703 A2

EP 0986703 A2 2000-03-22 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTROMECHANICAL SETTING DEVICE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTROMECHANICAL SETTING DEVICE

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM STEUERN EINES ELEKTROMECHANISCHEN STELLGERÄTS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LA COMMANDE D'UN APPAREIL DE REGLAGE ELECTROMECANIQUE

Publication

EP 0986703 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98933511 A

Priority

  • DE 9801318 W
  • DE 19723931 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19723931A1] The invention relates to a device for controlling an electromechanical setting device, comprising a final setting element and a setting drive mechanism. Said setting drive mechanism comprises an electromagnet which has a core (112) and a coil (113). The setting drive also has a moveable anchor plate (115). A controller is provided, the control variable of said controller being the current through the coil (113) and the setting variable being a voltage which is applied to said coil. A source of voltage (8) is also provided to produce the supply current. A pulse duration modulator (42) modulates the setting variable in dependence on the supply voltage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/20; F01L 9/04; H03K 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 9/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01); H01F 7/16 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01); H02K 33/02 (2006.01); F02D 13/02 (2006.01); H01F 7/123 (2006.01); H01H 47/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/1844 (2013.01); F01L 9/04 (2013.01); F02D 41/20 (2013.01); F02D 13/0253 (2013.01); F02D 2041/001 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2027 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2051 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2058 (2013.01); H01F 7/123 (2013.01); H01H 47/325 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855748A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19723931 A1 19981210; EP 0986703 A2 20000322; EP 0986703 B1 20021002; JP 2002506566 A 20020226; US 6297941 B1 20011002; WO 9855748 A2 19981210; WO 9855748 A3 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051201

2004-07-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040719

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-25 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040525

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805814 20021107

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010629

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991118

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR