Global patent index - EP 0986727 A1

EP 0986727 A1 2000-03-22 - HEAT EXCHANGER MADE FROM A MIXTURE OF SILICON CARBIDE AND MOLYBEDENUM DISILICIDE

Title (en)

HEAT EXCHANGER MADE FROM A MIXTURE OF SILICON CARBIDE AND MOLYBEDENUM DISILICIDE

Title (de)

WÄRMETAUSCHER AUS EINEM GEMISCH VON SILIZIUMKARBID UND MOLYBDÄNDISILIZID

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR CONSTITUE D'UN MELANGE DE CARBURE DE SILICIUM ET DE SILICIURE DE MOLYBDENE

Publication

EP 0986727 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98934812 A

Priority

  • DE 9801451 W
  • DE 19723159 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19723159A1] The invention relates to a ceramic recuperative high-temperature heat exchanger (1), wherein all components coming into contact with primary (P) and/or secondary (S) media are made of high-temperature resistant material. The high-temperature material consists of a mixture of SiC and MoSi2. The self-defining flow channels (4) and flow areas (5) of the heat exchanger are formed by plates (6), comprising a congruent matrix configuration of truncated recesses (7) with an open bottom. The plates (6) are stacked on top of each other in such a way that the tubular lower end of the covering surface of the recesses (7) of the upper plate (6) rests on the spherical covering surface of the recesses of the plates (6) disposed thereunder, in such a way that the flow channels (4) are formed by the substantially self-aligned recesses (7). The flow area (5) which is formed between the plates (6) is lower in height than the recesses (7). It is penetrated by the covering surfaces of the recesses (7) in the form of columns. The flow areas (5) have inflows and outflows only.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/28 (2006.01); F28F 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/28 (2013.01); F28F 21/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855814A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19723159 A1 19981210; DE 19723159 C2 20020606; AT 202629 T 20010715; EP 0986727 A1 20000322; EP 0986727 B1 20010627; WO 9855814 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59800939

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20080604

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080522

2009-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080522

2009-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090119

2008-09-30 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20080604

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080306

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-11 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

- Ref Legal Event Code: FC

2008-05-09 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RN

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-02-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-01-14 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-05-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-06-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020502

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-09-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800939

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-08-02

2001-07-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-06-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB LI SE

2001-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 202629

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-11-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: HEAT EXCHANGER MADE FROM A MIXTURE OF SILICON CARBIDE AND MOLYBDENUM DISILICIDE

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991215

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB LI SE