Global Patent Index - EP 0986799 A1

EP 0986799 A1 2000-03-22 - ALARM SYSTEM

Title (en)

ALARM SYSTEM

Title (de)

ALARMSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'ALARME

Publication

EP 0986799 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98928432 A

Priority

  • GB 9801674 W
  • GB 9711745 A
  • GB 9724593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9855976A1] An alarm system is disclosed comprising a control panel (1), a first plurality of detectors (4) and a second plurality of sounders (5) mounted upon a common pair of wires. The system is operated by a method comprising the generation by one or more detectors of an alarm signal; the generation of a predetermined power pulse pattern at the control panel at a level sufficient to power the sounders; recognition of the pulse pattern at the alarm indicating devices and generation of alarm indication in response thereto.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 25/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/04 (2006.01); G08B 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/04 (2013.01); G08B 27/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855976A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9855976 A1 19981210; AU 8026498 A 19981221; DE 69802930 D1 20020124; DE 69802930 T2 20020808; EP 0986799 A1 20000322; EP 0986799 B1 20011212; ES 2170504 T3 20020801

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150609

2016-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160729

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69802930

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140425

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140612

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170504 T3

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802930 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001208

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991117

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI