Global Patent Index - EP 0986819 A1

EP 0986819 A1 2000-03-22 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FLEXIBLE CABLE HARNESS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING A FLEXIBLE CABLE HARNESS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FLEXIBLEN LEITUNGSSTRANGES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UN FAISCEAU DE LIGNES FLEXIBLE

Publication

EP 0986819 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928246 A

Priority

  • DE 19723167 A
  • DE 19724685 A
  • EP 9802770 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9856013A1] The invention relates to a method for producing a flexible cable harness. According to the invention, several cables are fixed to one another by means of wrapping, preferably with a wrapping tape. The fixed cross-section of the bundle of cables is enlarged before wrapping and reduced after wrapping. The aim of the invention is to provide a simple method for producing a cable harness of this type which easily maintains an adequate degree of flexibility after fixed wrapping. To this end, an extended body similar to a cable (5) is introduced into the bundle of cables (cables 1 to 4) before wrapping, said extended body having an adjustable cross section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/04 (2006.01); H01B 7/00 (2006.01); H01B 7/17 (2006.01); H01B 13/012 (2006.01); H01B 13/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/0045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9856013A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9856013 A1 19981210; CN 1149587 C 20040512; CN 1259224 A 20000705; CZ 294460 B6 20050112; CZ 9904183 A3 20000315; DE 19724685 C1 19981224; DE 59814258 D1 20080911; EP 0986819 A1 20000322; EP 0986819 B1 20080730; ES 2310930 T3 20090116; HU 0002998 A2 20010129; HU 0002998 A3 20030428; HU 222943 B1 20031229; JP 2002501666 A 20020115; JP 4698774 B2 20110608; PL 186650 B1 20040227; PL 335964 A1 20000605; US 6239374 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160526

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-07-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090506

2009-01-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20081230

2009-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2310930 T3

2008-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59814258 P 20080911

2008-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2008-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070824

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT