Global Patent Index - EP 0986820 A1

EP 0986820 A1 2000-03-22 - ELECTROMAGNET, SPECIALLY FOR ACTUATING VALVES

Title (en)

ELECTROMAGNET, SPECIALLY FOR ACTUATING VALVES

Title (de)

ELEKTROMAGNET, INSBESONDERE ZUM BETÄTIGEN VON VENTILEN

Title (fr)

ELECTROAIMANT, NOTAMMENT POUR LA COMMANDE DE SOUPAPES

Publication

EP 0986820 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98910690 A

Priority

  • DE 19717445 A
  • EP 9800893 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19717445A1] The invention relates to an electromagnet (1) for actuating valves, comprising a sheath-like magnet housing (3) encompassing a pole core (31) forming a one-sided closure of said housing (3) which is connected to the pole core (31) by an annular groove (35) incorporated into its periphery, by an O ring (37) which can be accommodated therein as a sealing element and by an annular groove (39) in the magnet housing (3) which forms bearing surfaces joined in positive fit to the inner walls of the annular groove (37) and a sealing surface located on the O-ring (37).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 7/16; H01F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/08 (2006.01); H01F 7/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 7/1607 (2013.01); H01F 7/081 (2013.01); H01F 2007/1661 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849696A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IE IT MC PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19717445 A1 19981029; DE 19717445 C2 19991118; EP 0986820 A1 20000322; EP 0986820 B1 20050202; ES 2236892 T3 20050716; JP 2002510433 A 20020402; US 6344783 B1 20020205; WO 9849696 A1 19981105

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59812542

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140213

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-02-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HYDAC ELECTRONIC GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HYDRAULIK RING GMBH, HYDAC ELECTRONIC GMBH, , DE

- Document: DE 59812542

- Effective date: 20111216

2012-02-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HILITE GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HYDRAULIK RING GMBH, HYDAC ELECTRONIC GMBH, , DE

- Document: DE 59812542

- Effective date: 20111216

2012-02-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HILITE GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: HYDRAULIK RING GMBH, 09212 LIMBACH-OBERFROHNA, DE; HYDAC ELECTRONIC GMBH, 66128 SAARBRUECKEN, DE

- Document: DE 59812542

- Effective date: 20111216

2012-02-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HYDAC ELECTRONIC GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: HYDRAULIK RING GMBH, 09212 LIMBACH-OBERFROHNA, DE; HYDAC ELECTRONIC GMBH, 66128 SAARBRUECKEN, DE

- Document: DE 59812542

- Effective date: 20111216

2012-02-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812542

- Representative's name: BARTELS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20111216

2012-02-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812542

- Representative's name: BARTELS UND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20111216

2011-12-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812542

- Representative's name: BARTELS & PARTNER, PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060217

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070219

2008-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070219

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070217

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050702

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070217

2006-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060213

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2236892 T3

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-03-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812542 P 20050310

2005-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT MC PT

2005-02-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-02-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050202

2005-02-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050202

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDRAULIK-RING GMBH

2000-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HYDAC ELECTRONIC GMBH

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990723

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IE IT MC PT