Global Patent Index - EP 0986832 A1

EP 0986832 A1 2000-03-22 - ELECTROLYTIC REACTOR SUCH AS FUEL CELL WITH ZEOLITE MEMBRANE

Title (en)

ELECTROLYTIC REACTOR SUCH AS FUEL CELL WITH ZEOLITE MEMBRANE

Title (de)

ELEKTROLYTISCHER REAKTOR, WIE BRENNSTOFFZELLE MIT ZEOLITHMEMBRAN

Title (fr)

REACTEUR ELECTROLYTIQUE, TEL QU'UNE PILE A COMBUSTIBLE, DOTE D'UNE MEMBRANE EN ZEOLITE

Publication

EP 0986832 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98921610 A

Priority

  • GB 9801380 W
  • GB 9709742 A
  • GB 9723840 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9852243A1] An electrochemical reactor such as a fuel cell has a zeolite membrane (7) separating the anode (4) and cathode (5) compartments which allows the passage of ions through the membrane to carry an electric current, but prevents the passage of fuel molecules etc. through the membrane which might poison the catalyst used in the fuel cell. It is useful in methanol fuel cells using a basic electrolyte such as a carbonate salt and there can be a second zeolite membrane which prevents escape of methanol into the atmosphere which enables the fuel cell to operate at higher temperatures and hence be more efficient.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 8/08; H01M 8/10; H01M 8/02; C25B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25B 5/00 (2006.01); C25B 13/04 (2006.01); H01M 4/92 (2006.01); H01M 8/02 (2006.01); H01M 8/08 (2006.01); H01M 8/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 8/08 (2013.01); C25B 5/00 (2013.01); C25B 13/04 (2013.01); H01M 8/0293 (2013.01); H01M 8/1009 (2013.01); H01M 8/1016 (2013.01); Y02E 60/566 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9852243 A1 19981119; AU 741520 B2 20011206; AU 7439998 A 19981208; CA 2289607 A1 19981119; CN 1255248 A 20000531; EP 0986832 A1 20000322; JP 2002500806 A 20020108

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-22 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1026777

2005-01-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020714

2000-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMART (ISLE OF MAN) LIMITED

2000-08-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991021

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE