Global Patent Index - EP 0986842 A1

EP 0986842 A1 2000-03-22 - RING FOR MARKING WORKING VOLTAGE OF ELECTRICAL CONNECTION ELEMENT

Title (en)

RING FOR MARKING WORKING VOLTAGE OF ELECTRICAL CONNECTION ELEMENT

Title (de)

RING ZUR KENNZEICHNUNG DER BETRIEBSSPANNUNG EINES ELEKTRISCHEN STECKVERBINDERELEMENTES

Title (fr)

BAGUE DE REPERAGE DE LA TENSION D'EMPLOI D'UN ELEMENT DE CONNEXION ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 0986842 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99910460 A

Priority

  • FR 9900736 W
  • FR 9804290 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2777120A1] The invention concerns marking means for noting the working voltage of an electrical connection element (2; 4), mounted on an accessory or support (3; 5), characterised in that it is in the form of at least a coloured ring (9a, 9b) arranged to be inserted between the connection element (2;4) and its support (3; 5), at least one of the ring dimensions in diametrical direction being not smaller than the corresponding dimensions of the connection element (2; 4) and/or its support (3; 5) at their interface so as to have an annular peripheral display surface (11a, 11b) which, at least partly, is flush with or projects from said connection element and/or its support.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/465 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952183A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2777120 A1 19991008; FR 2777120 B1 20000505; AU 2940999 A 19991025; AU 746301 B2 20020418; CA 2295143 A1 19991014; DE 69901987 D1 20020808; DE 69901987 T2 20030206; EP 0986842 A1 20000322; EP 0986842 B1 20020703; ES 2177261 T3 20021201; US 6302726 B1 20011016; WO 9952183 A1 19991014; ZA 9907478 B 20000605

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160317

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-06-30 [PGRI DE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Effective date: 20120928

2013-08-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69901987

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2013-04-17 [REG ES GD2A] CONTRACTUAL LICENCES

- Effective date: 20130417

2013-03-15 [REG DE R088] EXCLUSIVE LICENCE REGISTERED

- Document: DE 69901987

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2004-11-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-03-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040330

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-03-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030318

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2177261 T3

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901987 20020808

2002-07-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011129

2000-04-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000217

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT