Global patent index - EP 0986848 A1

EP 0986848 A1 2000-03-22 - LASER SYSTEMS USING PHASE CONJUGATE FEEDBACK

Title (en)

LASER SYSTEMS USING PHASE CONJUGATE FEEDBACK

Title (de)

LASERSYSTEME MIT RUECKKOPPLUNG DURCH PHASENKONJUGIERUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES LASER UTILISANT UNE RETROACTION A CONJUGAISON DE PHASE

Publication

EP 0986848 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98925450 A

Priority

  • DK 9800230 W
  • DK 66597 A
  • DK 9098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9856087A1] A laser system for emission of a highly coherent, possibly single mode, output light beam, comprising a first laser (30), such as an array of broad area lasers, for emission of a first high power light beam. An external cavity is formed between the laser and e.g. a phase conjugator (35) emitting a second light beam in response to the first incident light beam. A frequency selective element (37), such as an etalon, is positioned in the external cavity. The feedback from the external cavity forces the first laser to emit a stable and significantly improved spatially and temporally coherent high power output beam. Furthermore, in the external cavity a frequency doubler crystal (166) may be positioned for frequency doubling at least a part of the light beam in the cavity. The frequency doubler crystal may advantageously be positioned inside the etalon (221) where the laser beam has high intensity and high temporal coherence.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01S 3/10; H01S 3/109; H01S 5/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01S 3/109 (2006.01); H01S 3/10 (2006.01); H01S 5/40 (2006.01); H01S 3/0941 (2006.01); H01S 3/098 (2006.01); H01S 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01S 3/10076 (2013.01); H01S 5/4062 (2013.01); H01S 3/08036 (2013.01); H01S 3/09415 (2013.01); H01S 3/109 (2013.01); H01S 5/145 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9856087A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9856087 A1 19981210; AU 7757098 A 19981221; CN 1259236 A 20000705; EP 0986848 A1 20000322; JP 2002503392 A 20020129

INPADOC legal status

2007-01-05 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1029447

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-03-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TORSANA LASER TECHNOLOGIES A/S

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010319

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000107

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE