Global patent index - EP 0986939 A1

EP 0986939 A1 2000-03-22 - PLASMA PROCESSING DEVICE FOR SURFACES

Title (en)

PLASMA PROCESSING DEVICE FOR SURFACES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR PLASMABEHANDLUNG VON OBERFLÄCHEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACES AU PLASMA

Publication

EP 0986939 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919177 A

Priority

  • DE 29805999 U
  • EP 9902256 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6265690B1] A mechanism for plasma surface treatment includes a rotating head having at least one eccentrically disposed plasma nozzle for generating a plasma jet directed in parallel with the axis of rotation. The nozzle includes a swirl system for swirling the plasma jet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05H 1/34; B05D 3/14; B29C 59/14; H05H 1/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05H 1/24 (2006.01); B05D 3/14 (2006.01); B29C 59/14 (2006.01); C08J 7/00 (2006.01); H05H 1/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 59/14 (2013.01); B05D 3/144 (2013.01); H05H 1/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952333A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29805999 U1 19980625; AT 270028 T 20040715; EP 0986939 A1 20000322; EP 0986939 B1 20040623; ES 2224644 T3 20050301; JP 2002500818 A 20020108; JP 4255518 B2 20090415; US 6265690 B1 20010724; WO 9952333 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-04-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2224644

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2004-11-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20041019

2004-11-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909795

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI

2004-06-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PLASMATREAT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991103

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI