Global Patent Index - EP 0986968 A3

EP 0986968 A3 2001-03-07 - Plastic moulded shoe bottom provided with small ducts for water and sand evacuation

Title (en)

Plastic moulded shoe bottom provided with small ducts for water and sand evacuation

Title (de)

Aus Kunststoff gegossener Schuhboden mit kleinen Kanälen für den Wasser- und Sandablauf

Title (fr)

Semelle de chaussure en plastique moulé avec des petits canaux pour l'évacuation de l'eau et du sable

Publication

EP 0986968 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99830564 A

Priority

IT AN980054 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0986968A2] The present invention relates to a plastic moulded shoe bottom, of the type provided with an insole on the upper part and a network of channels on the upper side, preferably in the proximity of the external edge of the bottom, leading up to ducts with vertical axis affecting the whole thickness of the bottom; it being provided that the insole features a series of through holes with vertical axis, preferably aligned with the channels below. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/08; A43B 7/08; A43B 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/08 (2006.01); A43B 7/08 (2006.01); A43B 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 3/0026 (2013.01); A43B 5/08 (2013.01); A43B 7/088 (2013.01); A43B 13/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0986968 A2 20000322; EP 0986968 A3 20010307; IT 244876 Y1 20020314; IT AN980054 U1 20000320; IT AN980054 V0 19980918

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010908

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI