Global Patent Index - EP 0986980 A1

EP 0986980 A1 2000-03-22 - Pushing device for displaying articles on a shelf

Title (en)

Pushing device for displaying articles on a shelf

Title (de)

Schubvorrichtung zur Präsentation von Artikeln auf einem Regal

Title (fr)

Dispositif à poussoir pour la presentation d'articles sur un rayonnage

Publication

EP 0986980 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402241 A

Priority

FR 9811488 A

Abstract (en)

A pushbutton (2) is able to slide on a runner (4) and is returned by a spring. The pushbutton comprises a base (6) and a wall (8) which is supported against the articles. A locking part (30) which can rotate relative to the runner engages the runner.

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif de présentation d'articles pour rayonnage comprend une glissière (4), un poussoir (2) apte à coulisser sur la glissière et des moyens de rappel du poussoir, le poussoir comprenant une partie de blocage (30) apte à être engagée avec la glissière (4) pour bloquer le poussoir et à être désengagée par une sollicitation sur le poussoir. Au moins la partie de blocage (30) est mobile à rotation par rapport à la glissière (4) pour son engagement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 1/126 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0986980 A1 20000322; FR 2783144 A1 20000317; FR 2783144 B1 20001201

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031217

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020903

2000-12-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-05-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DRIVER

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI